Rajasthan Legislative Assembly Election 2023
Rajasthan Legislative Assembly election 2023
The 2023 Rajasthan Legislative Assembly election was held on 25 November 2023 to elect 199 of the 200 members of the state’s Legislative Assembly. The result of the election is scheduled to be declared on December 03, 2023. The election for the remaining 1 seat has been postponed.
Following the passing of Congress candidate Gurmeet Singh Koonar, the Election Commission postponed polls in the Karanpur constituency, meaning that just 199 of the 200 seats in the Rajasthan Assembly would be up for contention on November 25.
The election for Rajasthan Legislative Assembly for 200 seats is to be held in 1 phase i.e 25 November 2023.
The tenure of Rajasthan Legislative Assembly is scheduled to end on 14 January 2024. The previous assembly elections were held in December 2018. After the election, Indian National Congress formed the state government, with Ashok Gehlot becoming Chief Minister.
Also, On March 30, 1949, the four states viz. Jodhpur, Jaipur, Bikaner and Jaisalmer joined this integration, and the region came to be known as the Greater Rajasthan. The principalities of Neemra and Lawa also joined this. March 30th is now celebrated as Rajasthan day.
Rajasthan Legislative Assembly election 2023 – Schedule
Poll Event | Date | Day |
Notification Date | 30 October 2023 | Monday |
Start of nomination | 30 October 2023 | Monday |
Last Date for filing nomination | 6 November 2023 | Monday |
Scrutiny of nomination | 7 November 2023 | Tuesday |
Last Date for Withdrawal of nomination | 9 November 2023 | Thursday |
Date of Poll | 25 November 2023 | Saturday |
Date of Counting of Votes | 3 December 2023 | Sunday |
Rajasthan Legislative Assembly election 2023
Election name | Rajasthan Assembly Election 2023 |
Authority | Election Commission of India |
Term ending on | January 14, 2024 |
Total seats | 200 |
Current government | Congress |
The current Chief Minister of Rajasthan | Ashok Gehlot |
Major Parties | Indian National Congress, Bharatiya Janata Party (BJP) |
Rajasthan election date 2023 | November 25, 2023 |
Result Date | 3 December 2023 |
Majority seats | 101 |
Rajasthan Legislative Assembly election 2023
Number of Assembly seats | |
Total seats: | 200 |
Reserved for SCs: | 34 |
Reserved for STs: | 25 |
General seats: | 141 |
Rajasthan Legislative Assembly election 2023
The tenure of Rajasthan Legislative Assembly is scheduled to end on 14 January 2024. The previous assembly elections were held in December 2018. After the election, Indian National Congress formed the state government, with Ashok Gehlot becoming Chief Minister. Out of the 200 members of the house, the Congress won 99 seats in the 2018 Rajasthan assembly elections, while the BJP won 73.
How to know your candidate?
In Rajasthan, which has a history of switching governments every three decades, the governing Congress party is vying for a second term in a row. Chief Minister Ashok Gehlot is one of the over 1,875 candidates running for seats including 183 female candidates in Rajasthan’s elections.
The history of Chief Ministries for the state of Rajasthan is mentioned below:
Chief Minister | Term | Party |
Heera Lal Shastri | 7 April, 1949-5 January, 1951 | Indian National Congress |
C S Venkatachari | 6 January, 1951- 25 April, 1951 | Indian National Congress |
Jai Narayan Vyas | 26 April, 1951- 3 March, 1952 | Indian National Congress |
Tika Ram Paliwal | 3 March, 1952- 31 October, 1952 | Indian National Congress |
Jai Narayan Vyas | 1 November, 1952- 12 November, 1954 | Indian National Congress |
Mohan Lal Sukhadia | 13 November, 1954 – 11 April, 1957 | Indian National Congress |
Mohan Lal Sukhadia | 11 April, 1957- 11 March, 1962 | Indian National Congress |
Mohan Lal Sukhadia | 12 March, 1962- 13 March, 1967 | Indian National Congress |
President’s rule | 13 March, 1967- 26 April, 1967 | |
Mohan Lal Sukhadia | 26 April, 1967- 9 July, 1971 | Indian National Congress |
Barkatullah Khan | 9 July, 1971- 11 August, 1973 | Indian National Congress |
Hari Dev Joshi | 11 August, 1973- 29 April , 1977 | Indian National Congress |
President’s rule | 29 April, 1977- 22 June, 1977 | |
Bhairon Singh Shekhawat | 22 June, 1977- 16 February, 1980 | Janata Party |
Jagannath Pahadia | 6 June, 1980- 13 July, 1981 | Indian National Congress |
Shiv Charan Mathur | 14 July, 1981- 23 February, 1985 | Indian National Congress |
Hira Lal Devpura | 23 February, 1985 – 10 March , 1985 | Indian National Congress |
Hari Dev Joshi | 10 March, 1985- 20 January, 1988 | Indian National Congress |
Shiv Charan Mathur | 20 January, 1988 – 4 December, 1989 | Indian National Congress |
Hari Dev Joshi | 4 December, 1989- 4 March, 1990 | Indian National Congress |
Bhairon Singh Shekhawat | 4 March, 1990- 15 December, 1992 | Bharatiya Janata Party |
President’s rule | 15 December, 1992 – 4 December, 1993 | |
Bhairon Singh Shekhawat | 4 December, 1993 – 29 November, 1998 | Bharatiya Janata Party |
Ashok Gehlot | 1 December, 1998- 8 December, 2003 | Indian National Congress |
Vasundhara Raje Scindia | 8 December, 2003- 11 December, 2008 | Bharatiya Janata Party |
Ashok Gehlot | 12 December, 2008- 13 December, 2013 | Indian National Congress |
Vasundhara Raje Scindia | 13 December, 2013- 12 December, 2018 | Bharatiya Janata Party |
Ashok Gehlot | 17 December 2018 – Incumbent | Indian National Congress |
To know about 26/11 attack click here:
One Response